Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0787077 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0787077



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 573
22.04.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.04.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.04.2002 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
01.03.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.03.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.02.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
21.02.2002 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
17.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.01.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.01.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.01.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.01.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
13.12.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
08.11.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.11.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.11.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
02.11.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
31.10.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
31.10.2001 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
08.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
30.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
12.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.03.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.02.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.02.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
20.10.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.10.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.10.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
13.10.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.10.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
13.10.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.10.2000 Claims Appeal 2
13.10.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
12.10.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
25.08.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
25.08.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.08.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.08.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.08.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.06.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.06.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
13.06.2000 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
13.06.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 16
13.06.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
03.05.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
27.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.04.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.04.2000 Claims Opposition 2
18.04.2000 Claims Opposition 6
18.04.2000 Claims Opposition 5
18.04.2000 Claims Opposition 3
18.04.2000 Claims Opposition 6
18.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
17.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 30
12.04.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
11.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
20.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
01.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.02.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.02.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.02.2000 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
24.02.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.02.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.02.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
04.02.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
03.02.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
02.02.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.02.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
26.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
26.01.2000 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
26.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.01.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
05.01.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
05.01.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
05.01.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.01.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.01.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
05.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 21
30.12.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.12.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
17.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
16.12.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
10.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.12.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
02.12.1999 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
02.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
02.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
19.11.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
11.11.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.11.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.11.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.10.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.09.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
06.09.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
22.07.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.07.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.07.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
16.07.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
06.07.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.07.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.06.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
04.03.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.03.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.01.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
21.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
12.03.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.03.1998 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.01.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.01.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
13.01.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
21.10.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
14.10.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.09.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
05.09.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
25.06.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.04.1997 Claims Search / examination 5
03.04.1997 Description Search / examination 6
03.04.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.04.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.08.1996 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 11
26.08.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
24.06.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.05.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
02.05.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
02.05.1996 Priority document Search / examination 16
20.08.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2