Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0791017

EP0791017 - POLYMERIZATION IN AQUEOUS MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.06.2001 [2001/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
407 Royal Parade
Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1997/35]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
407 Royal Parade
Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / MOAD, Graeme
137 Monbulk Road
Kallista, VIC 3791 / AU
02 / MOAD, Catherine, Louise
137 Monbulk Road
Kallista, VIC 3791 / AU
03 / KRSTINA, Julia
16B Elsie Grove
Chelsea, VIC 3196 / AU
04 / RIZZARDO, Ezio
26 Alex Avenue
Wheelers Hill, VIC 3150 / AU
05 / THANG, San, Hoa
180 Clarinda Road
Clayton South, VIC 3169 / AU
06 / FRYD, Michael
50 East Maple Avenue
Moorestown, NJ 08057-1910 / US
[1997/35]
Representative(s)Woodcraft, David Charles , et al
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/35]Woodcraft, David Charles , et al
BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London, WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date95939795.108.11.1995
[1997/35]
WO1995US14429
Priority number, dateAU1994PM0930409.11.1994         Original published format: AU PM930494
[1997/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9615158
Date:23.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0791017
Date:27.08.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996
[1997/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0791017
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search reportEP23.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/38, C08F2/22
[1997/35]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [1997/35]
TitleGerman:POLYMERISATION IN WÄSSRIGEN MEDIEN[1997/35]
English:POLYMERIZATION IN AQUEOUS MEDIA[1997/35]
French:POLYMERISATION EN MILIEU AQUEUX[1997/35]
Entry into regional phase10.04.1997National basic fee paid 
10.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/35]
18.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2000Fee for grant paid
15.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0261942  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DX]EP0199436  (DU PONT [US]) [D,X] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US4526945  (CARLSON GARY M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4680354  (LIN JU-CHUI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9517435  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [P,X] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - A. F. BURCZYK, "COBALTOXIME AS A CATALYTIC CHAIN TRANSFER AGENT", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, vol. 22, pages 3255 - 3262, [A] 1
Examination WO9613527
  WO9527737
  WO9504759
  US5324879