Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0861052

EP0861052 - MOUTH PROP FOR USE IN DENTISTRY AND FOR ORAL CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.2005  [2005/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Poindexter, Forrest R.
3086 Savoy Drive
Fairfax, VA 22031 / US
[1998/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/36]
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/36]Harding, Charles Thomas
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date95939960.113.11.1995
[1998/36]
WO1995US14830
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9717906
Date:22.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0861052
Date:02.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997
[1998/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/08
[2000/08]
Former International [1998/36]A61C5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/36]
TitleGerman:MUNDHAUFHALTEVORRICHTUNG DIE IN/DER ZAHNMEDIZIN UND BEI/DER MUNDPFLEGEANGEWENDET WIRD[1998/36]
English:MOUTH PROP FOR USE IN DENTISTRY AND FOR ORAL CARE[1998/36]
French:DISPOSITIF DESTINE A MAINTENIR LA BOUCHE OUVERTE, UTILE EN DENTISTERIE ET POUR DES SOINS BUCCAUX[1998/36]
Entry into regional phase13.05.1998National basic fee paid 
13.05.1998Search fee paid 
13.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
08.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/17]
25.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200410   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4167814  (SCHUBERT ROBERT E) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11 * column 2, line 36 - line 53; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE1441321  (ERICKSON NORMAN R) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4975057  (DYFVERMARK ULF T [SE]);
 [Y]US3722101  (VIA W);
 [Y]US802408  (ROWE WILLIAM ALEXANDER [US]);
 [Y]US765537  (ABBOTT FRANK P [US])
 [X]  - SHUR-PROP Advertisement, May 1984.,
by applicantUS2220674
 US3924333
 US4167814
 US4192071
 US4975057