Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0785947

EP0785947 - PEPTIDES ENDOWED WITH ANTIINFLAMMATORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITALFARMACO S.p.A.
Viale Fulvio Testi, 330
20126 Milano / IT
[1997/31]
Inventor(s)01 / LUCIETTO, Pierluigi
Via G. Carducci, 125
20099 Sesto S. Giovanni / IT
02 / GIULIANI, Paola
Via G. Carducci, 125
20099 Sesto S. Giovanni / IT
03 / FOSSATI, Gianluca
Via G. Carducci, 125
20099 Sesto S. Giovanni / IT
04 / MASCAGNI, Paolo
Via G. Carducci, 125
20099 Sesto S. Giovanni / IT
05 / GROMO, Gianni
Via G. Carducci, 125
20099 Sesto S. Giovanni / IT
[1997/31]
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]Minoja, Fabrizio
Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95940217.320.11.1995
[1997/31]
WO1995EP04566
Priority number, dateIT1994MI0235821.11.1994         Original published format: IT MI942358
[1997/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9616083
Date:30.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0785947
Date:30.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996
[1997/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0785947
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/35, A61K39/04
[1997/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/31]
TitleGerman:PEPTIDE MIT ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE AKTIVITÄT[1997/31]
English:PEPTIDES ENDOWED WITH ANTIINFLAMMATORY ACTIVITY[1997/31]
French:PEPTIDES DOTES D'UNE ACTIVITE ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE[1997/31]
Entry into regional phase22.05.1997National basic fee paid 
22.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
25.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2000Fee for grant paid
19.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
GR06.09.2000
IT06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
NL06.09.2000
IE20.11.2000
LU20.11.2000
MC30.11.2000
DK06.12.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/39]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
GR06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
NL06.09.2000
IE20.11.2000
LU20.11.2000
MC30.11.2000
DK06.12.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2004/07]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
GR06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
NL06.09.2000
IE20.11.2000
MC30.11.2000
DK06.12.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2003/45]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
NL06.09.2000
IE20.11.2000
MC30.11.2000
DK06.12.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2003/09]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
NL06.09.2000
IE20.11.2000
MC30.11.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2002/42]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
IE20.11.2000
MC30.11.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2002/17]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
IE20.11.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2002/02]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
CH06.09.2000
LI06.09.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2001/37]AT06.09.2000
BE06.09.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2001/27]BE06.09.2000
PT06.12.2000
SE06.12.2000
Former [2001/22]BE06.09.2000
PT06.12.2000
Former [2001/18]PT06.12.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2251186  (GATZ RANDALL NEAL, et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9204049  (UNIV UTRECHT [NL], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO8912455  (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US], et al) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8701118  (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-40 *
 [A]  - D.J.HARTMAN, "Identification of a mammalian 10 kDa HSP ...", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, vol. 89, pages 3394 - 3398, [A] 1-5