Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0794974

EP0794974 - STABILIZED POLYESTER SHAPING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [1997/38]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEITZ, Thomas
Lessingstrasse 15
D-67125 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE
02 / HEYM, Manfred
Bachweg 6
D-67273 Weisenheim / DE
03 / MÜHLBACH, Klaus
Im Zaunrücken 20
D-67269 Grünstadt / DE
04 / PLACHETTA, Christoph
Danziger Strasse 1
D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE
[1997/38]
Application number, filing date95940222.321.11.1995
[1997/38]
WO1995EP04577
Priority number, dateDE1994444272401.12.1994         Original published format: DE 4442724
[1997/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9617011
Date:06.06.1996
Language:DE
[1996/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0794974
Date:17.09.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996
[1997/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0794974
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search reportEP06.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/29, C08L67/00
[1997/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1997/38]
TitleGerman:STABILISIERTE POLYESTER FORMMASSEN[1997/38]
English:STABILIZED POLYESTER SHAPING COMPOUNDS[1997/38]
French:MATIERES DE MOULAGE EN POLYESTER STABILISEES[1997/38]
Entry into regional phase07.05.1997National basic fee paid 
07.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/38]
14.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.1999Fee for grant paid
21.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[PA]EP0628541  (BASF AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5357021  (TYE ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *