Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0799164

EP0799164 - METHOD FOR FIBERIZING MINERAL MATERIAL WITH ORGANIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWENS CORNING
One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo
Ohio 43659 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]For all designated states
OWENS CORNING
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AULT, Patrick, L.
2795 Ritchey Road
Newark, OH 43055 / US
02 / PELLEGRIN, Michael, T.
505 Marion Manor Woods
Newark, OH 43055 / US
03 / LOFTUS, James, E.
1239 Normandy Drive
Newark, OH 43055 / US
[1997/41]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date95940812.127.11.1995
[1997/41]
WO1995US15244
Priority number, dateUS1994036350423.12.1994         Original published format: US 363504
[1997/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9620141
Date:04.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0799164
Date:08.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996
[1997/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0799164
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/04, C03C25/10
[2000/52]
Former International [1997/41]C03B37/04, C03C25/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ZUFASERN EINES MINERALEN MATERIALS MIT EINEM ORGANISCHEN MATERIAL[1997/41]
English:METHOD FOR FIBERIZING MINERAL MATERIAL WITH ORGANIC MATERIAL[1997/41]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES MINERALES AVEC UN MATERIAU ORGANIQUE[1997/41]
Entry into regional phase21.07.1997National basic fee paid 
21.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
22.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2001Fee for grant paid
07.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO9500454  (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *