EP0797620 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUSPENSION IN WATER OF A CELLULOSE ETHER, AND DRY MIXTURE SUITABLE FOR USE IN THE PRODUCTION OF THE SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76, Postbus 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states AKZO NOBEL N.V. Velperweg 76, Postbus 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Lars Masgatan 1 S-444 45 Stenungsund / SE | 02 /
BOSTRÖM, Peter Oskarsbergsgatan 10 S-442 53 Kungälv / SE | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Rolf, et al Akzo Nobel Surface Chemistry AB, Patent, Trademark and Licensing Department 444 85 Stenungsund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Andersson, Rolf, et al Akzo Nobel Surface Chemistry AB, Patent, Trademark and Licensing Department 444 85 Stenungsund / SE | Application number, filing date | 95941271.9 | 16.11.1995 | [1997/40] | WO1995SE01362 | Priority number, date | SE19940004373 | 15.12.1994 Original published format: SE 9404373 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618676 | Date: | 20.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797620 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797620 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L1/28, C08J3/03 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
C08J3/05 (EP,US);
C08L1/284 (EP,US);
C08J2301/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN CELLULOSEETHERSUSPENSION UND TROCKENMISCHUNG GEEIGNET ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER HERSTELLUNG DER SUSPENSION | [1997/40] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUSPENSION IN WATER OF A CELLULOSE ETHER, AND DRY MIXTURE SUITABLE FOR USE IN THE PRODUCTION OF THE SUSPENSION | [1997/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE SUSPENSION D'ETHER CELLULOSIQUE DANS DE L'EAU ET MELANGE SEC CONVENANT A LA PREPARATION DE LADITE SUSPENSION | [1997/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2002 | BE | 11.09.2002 | DK | 11.12.2002 | [2007/16] |
Former [2003/48] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 11.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP48026235 ; | [A]US3356519 (CHAMBERS WILLIAM C, et al); | [A]EP0413274 (AQUALON CO [US]); | [E]WO9530705 (BEROL NOBEL AB [SE], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 79, No. 6, 13 August 1973, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 32855, Abstract No. 32843z; & JP,A,48 026 235, (TONEDACHI, MASAYUKI et al.), 6 April 1973., & JP48026235 A 19730406 |