blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0796359 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0796359



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 107
07.10.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.08.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
20.08.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
10.08.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
31.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.07.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
22.07.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
06.05.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
06.05.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
30.03.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.02.1999 Description Search / examination 5
12.02.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
12.02.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
16.12.1998 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
19.06.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.06.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.03.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.08.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.07.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 8
27.05.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.04.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
05.08.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.06.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.06.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14
13.06.1996 Priority document Search / examination 12
07.12.1995 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1