blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0796359


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2002  [2002/15]
02.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
18.02.2000 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
24.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.11.1999 Renewal fee
20.08.1999 Change - applicant published on  06.10.1999 [1999/40]
20.08.1999 Change - representative published on  06.10.1999 [1999/40]
17.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
17.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant
01.03.1999 Examination report or reply
17.12.1998 Examination report or reply
01.12.1998 Renewal fee
03.07.1998 Examination report or reply
27.02.1998 First examination report
25.02.1998 Examination report or reply
03.12.1997 Renewal fee
08.08.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.09.1997 [1997/39]
08.08.1997 Request for examination filed published on  24.09.1997 [1997/39]
10.06.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
29.02.1996 PCT data prior to European publication