blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0796359
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0796359Global Dossier 05.04.2000B1
EP0796359 24.09.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE4443631 08.12.1994
EP9504801 07.12.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59508150D 11.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE4443631 08.12.1994
DE59508150 07.12.1995
EP9504801 07.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9617983Global Dossier 13.06.1996A1
Priority number Date
DE4443631 08.12.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ159697 15.12.1999A3
Priority number Date
DE4443631 08.12.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE4443631 13.06.1996A1
Priority number Date
DE4443631 08.12.1994