blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0796359

Designated contracting states CHLapse: 31.12.2000
 DE 
 LILapse: 31.12.2000
Examination procedure13.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase27.05.1997National basic fee paid 
27.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted05.04.2000
Opposition procedure06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 21.03.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:24.09.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):CH DE LI
 
Event date:24.09.1997 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19970527
 
Event date:15.04.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980303
 
Event date:06.10.1999 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:TEXPARTS GMBH
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):CH DE LI
 
Event date:14.04.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:14.04.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG
 
Event date:11.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59508150
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000511
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.09.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:31.12.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20001231
 
Event date:31.12.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20001231
 
Event date:21.03.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:15.08.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:02.10.2001 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20011002