Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0796359

EP0796359 - DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A SPINNING, TWISTING OR PACKAGE WINDING SPINDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEXParts GmbH
Löwentorstrasse 68
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/40]
Former [1997/39]For all designated states
SKF Textilmaschinen-Komponenten GmbH
Löwentorstrasse 68
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DÜRR, Gunter
Hegelweg 18
D-71691 Freiberg / DE
02 / ENGLER, Martin
Taubenheimstrasse 18
D-70372 Stuttgart / DE
03 / FÖRSTNER, Hans-Peter
Hindenburgstrasse 32
D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
04 / HOFSTETTER, Claus
Krumer Weg 4
D-73269 Hochdorf / DE
05 / OTT, Ulrich
Burgherrenstrasse 8
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
06 / SAILER, Martin
Riesbergstrasse 25
D-71540 Murrhardt / DE
07 / SPEISER, Helmut
Bei der Kapelle 11
D-71384 Weinstadt / DE
08 / WEIDNER-BOHNENBERGER, Stephan
Göppinger Strasse 34
D-73278 Schlierbach / DE
[1997/39]
Representative(s)Möbus, Daniela , et al
Patentanwältin Kaiserstrasse 85
72764 Reutlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/39]Möbus, Daniela , et al
Hindenburgstrasse 65
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Application number, filing date95941682.707.12.1995
[1997/39]
WO1995EP04801
Priority number, dateDE1994444363108.12.1994         Original published format: DE 4443631
[1997/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9617983
Date:13.06.1996
Language:DE
[1996/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0796359
Date:24.09.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996
[1997/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0796359
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:D01H7/04
[1997/39]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   LI [1997/39]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR LAGERUNG EINER SPINN-, ZWIRN- ODER UMWINDESPINDEL[1997/39]
English:DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A SPINNING, TWISTING OR PACKAGE WINDING SPINDLE[1997/39]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE LOGER UNE BROCHE DE FILATURE, DE RETORDAGE OU DE GUIPAGE[1997/39]
Entry into regional phase27.05.1997National basic fee paid 
27.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
03.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.1999Fee for grant paid
13.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.12.2000
LI31.12.2000
[2002/15]
Cited inInternational search[X]CH444584  (USTER SPINDEL MOTOREN MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 27 - line 40; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]EP0523000  (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 9-17 * column 3, line 22 - line 28 *;
 [A]CH539697  (USTER SPINDEL MOTOREN MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH359640  (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *