Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0801703

EP0801703 - APPARATUS FOR DEPLOYING WIRELINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.2001 [2001/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koopmans, Sietse Jelle
Hoogeind 29A
2321 Meer / BE
[1997/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Shanks, Andrew , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]Shanks, Andrew , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date95941819.529.12.1995
[1997/43]
WO1995GB03050
Priority number, dateGB1994002632329.12.1994         Original published format: GB 9426323
[1997/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9621081
Date:11.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0801703
Date:22.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996
[1997/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0801703
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:E21B19/22, E21B23/14
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/43]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABROLLEN EINES DRAHTSEILS[1997/43]
English:APPARATUS FOR DEPLOYING WIRELINE[1997/43]
French:APPAREIL POUR LA MISE EN PLACE D'UN CABLE DE FORAGE[1997/43]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1997National basic fee paid 
01.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
12.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.1999Fee for grant paid
09.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US5211203  (VOLLWEILER TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 7 - line 15 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 41 - line 48 * * column 7, line 4 - line 15 *;
 [X]US3381940  (WALSTROM JOHN E) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4050858  (EWBANK PHILLIP K, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 43 - line 55 *;
 [A]EP0326493  (GAZ DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 23 - line 28 * * column 3, line 50 - line 55 *
 [X]  - BLOUNT ET AL, "Coiled tubing ...operations and service", WORLD OIL, HOUSTON, TEXAS, USA, (199205), vol. 213, no. 5, pages 89 - 96, XP000268615 [X] 1-8 * page 89; figure 1 *