Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0786066

EP0786066 - PAINT DRYING OVEN WITH RADIANT ENERGY FLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DÜRR INDUSTRIES, INC.
40600 Plymouth Road
Plymouth, MI 48170-4297 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]For all designated states
DURR INDUSTRIES, INC.
40600 Plymouth Road
Plymouth, MI 48170-4297 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CROMPTON, David, W.
4220 Sunderland Way
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US
02 / STILL, Gregory, M.
8988 Colony Farm Drive
Plymouth, MI 48170 / US
03 / GORE, Anthony, R.
38855 Horton Drive
Farmington Hills, MI 48018 / US
[1997/31]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95942398.906.11.1995
[1997/31]
WO1995US14340
Priority number, dateUS1994033648309.11.1994         Original published format: US 336483
[1997/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9615415
Date:23.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0786066
Date:30.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996
[1997/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.05.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:F26B19/00, F26B25/00, F26B25/06, F26B3/34, F26B3/08, F26B23/10
[2000/36]
Former International [1997/31]F26B19/00, F26B25/00, F26B25/06, F26B3/34, F26B3/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/31]
TitleGerman:LACKTROCKNUNGSOFEN MIT STRAHLUNGSENERGIEBODEN[1997/31]
English:PAINT DRYING OVEN WITH RADIANT ENERGY FLOOR[1997/31]
French:ETUVE DE SECHAGE DE PEINTURE POURVUE D'UN PLANCHER A ENERGIE RAYONNANTE[1997/31]
Entry into regional phase23.05.1997National basic fee paid 
23.05.1997Search fee paid 
23.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
23.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/20]
05.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200006   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4761894  (HAMASAKI SHUJI ET AL) [A] 1,3,5,9,12,14 * column W *;
 [A]DE4215385  (IBK INDUSTRIEBEDARF GMBH) [A] 1,3,6,7,9,10,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1499227  (KYLE) [A] 1,7,9,12,14,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1403440  (MYERS) [A] 1,7,9,12,14,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE262725  (ACHILLES) [A] 6,9,13,15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5070625  ;
 [Y]US5113600  ;
 [A]US4635381  ;
 [A]US4546553  ;
 [A]US4972606