Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0792257

EP0792257 - MATERIAL FOR DICHROIC LIGHT POLARIZERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/36]DICHROIC LIGHT POLARIZERS
[2002/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optiva, Inc.
377 Oyster Point Blvd, Unit 13
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
Optiva, Inc.
377 Oyster Point Blvd, Unit 13
South San Francisco CA 94080 / US
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
Optiva, Inc.
1670 S. Amphlett Boulevard, Suite 214
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
Former [1997/36]For all designated states
RUSSIAN TECHNOLOGY GROUP
1670 S. Amphlett Boulevard, Suite 214
San Mateo, California 94402 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KHAN, Ir Gvon
pr. Patsaeva, 14-26
Dolgoprudniy, 141700 / RU
02 / BOBROV, Yuri A.
Zelenograd, 906-128
Moscow, 103575 / RU
03 / IGNATOV, Leonid Y.
ul. Angarskaia, 20-3-81
Moscow, 127635 / RU
04 / SHISHKINA, Elena Y.
ul. Angarskaia, 57-2-94
Moscow, 127412 / RU
05 / LAZAREV, Pavel, I.
806 Coleman Avenue 15
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
06 / KURBATOV, Alexey V.
Izumiudnava, 11-18
Moscow, 129281 / RU
[1997/36]
Representative(s)Ablewhite, Alan James
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/36]Ablewhite, Alan James
MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date95942844.217.11.1995
[1997/36]
WO1995US14413
Priority number, dateRU1994004172118.11.1994         Original published format: RU 94041721
RU1995010928405.06.1995         Original published format: RU 95109284
RU1995011356331.07.1995         Original published format: RU 95113563
RU1995011737706.10.1995         Original published format: RU 95117377
RU1995011740306.10.1995         Original published format: RU 95117403
[1997/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9616015
Date:30.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0792257
Date:03.09.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996
[1997/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0792257
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C50/18, C07C50/20, C07C50/22, C07C50/24, C07C50/26, C07C50/34, C07C50/36, C07C229/34, C07D221/02, C07D221/04, C07C309/44, C09B3/12, C09B3/50, C09B3/60, C09B5/26, C09B5/62, C09B69/10
[2000/03]
Former International [1997/36]C07C50/18, C07C50/20, C07C50/22, C07C50/24, C07C50/26, C07C50/34, C07C50/36, C07C229/34, C07D221/02, C07D221/04, C07D221/06
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/36]
TitleGerman:MATERIALIEN FÜR POLARISIERER FÜR DICHROIDES LICHT[2002/24]
English:MATERIAL FOR DICHROIC LIGHT POLARIZERS[2002/24]
French:MATERIAUX POUR DES POLARISEURS DE LUMIERE DICHROIQUES[2002/24]
Former [1997/36]POLARISIERER FÜR DICHROIDES LICHT
Former [1997/36]DICHROIC LIGHT POLARIZERS
Former [1997/36]POLARISEURS DE LUMIERE DICHROIQUES
Entry into regional phase16.06.1997National basic fee paid 
16.06.1997Search fee paid 
16.06.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/36]
12.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2002Fee for grant paid
20.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01119900.7  / EP1158320
EP01119901.5  / EP1158321
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]GB991976  (CIBA LTD) [X] 1 * example 2 *
International search[A]EP0049873  ;
 [A]EP0557121  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [A]US4133775  (BLOOM STANLEY M);
 [A]US4440541  (BERKE CARL M [US])