blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0812182

EP0812182 - ANTIPERSPIRANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.06.2010
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 07.07.2010  [2010/27]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  FR  IT 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1997/51]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / CORREIA, Martinho
4 Ashburn Close
Wetherby West Yorkshire LS22 5RB / GB
[1997/51]
Representative(s)Baker, Colin John, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Baker, Colin John, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [1997/51]Bryant, Tracey
Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date95943164.413.12.1995
[1997/51]
WO1995EP04999
Priority number, dateGB1995000249509.02.1995         Original published format: GB 9502495
[1997/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9624326
Date:15.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0812182
Date:17.12.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0812182
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.1996
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/32, A61K7/38
[1997/51]
CPC:
A61Q15/00 (EP); A61K8/046 (EP); A61K8/26 (EP);
A61K8/894 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/51]
TitleGerman:SCHWEISSHEMMENDE MITTEL[1997/51]
English:ANTIPERSPIRANT COMPOSITIONS[1997/51]
French:COMPOSITIONS ANTITRANSPIRATION[1997/51]
Entry into regional phase10.07.1997National basic fee paid 
10.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/51]
06.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
19.06.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.08.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2000Fee for grant paid
08.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.11.2001  21.11.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al
Page White & Farrer Limited
Bedford House
21A John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  27.11.2001  05.12.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Patente (FJP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  27.11.2001  10.12.2001  ADMISSIBLE
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Dossmann, Gérard, et al, et al
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/33]
Opponent(s)01  13.11.2001  21.11.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
 02  27.11.2001  05.12.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Patente (FJP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  27.11.2001  10.12.2001  ADMISSIBLE
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Dossmann, Gérard, et al, et al
Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2002/04]
Opponent(s)01  13.11.2001  21.11.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
 02  27.11.2001  05.12.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  27.11.2001   
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Dossmann, Gérard, et al, et al
Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Former [2002/03]
Opponent(s)01  13.11.2001  21.11.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
 02  27.11.2001  05.12.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2002/02]
Opponent(s)01  13.11.2001  21.11.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
11.01.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.05.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.11.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.11.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/27]
17.11.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.01.2006Appeal received No.  T1585/05
09.03.2006Statement of grounds filed
17.11.2009Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
02.01.2006Appeal received No.  T1585/05
22.12.2005Appeal received No.  T1585/05
21.12.2005Appeal received
17.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0499398  (DOW CORNING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [A]GB2050162  (DOW CORNING) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0373424  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [A]US4806338  (SMITH SCOTT E [US]) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [A]EP0485012  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-11 * column W *
 [A]  - A. J. DISAPIO, "new approaches to antiperspirant and deodorant formulation", HAPPI, RAMSEY, GB, (198602), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 43 - 52, XP002004766 [A] 1-11 * page 52; example 9 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.