Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0799251

EP0799251 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING STAR POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SUTHERLAND, Robert, Jude
16211 Cairngorm Avenue
Houston, TX 77095 / US
[1997/41]
Representative(s)Hart, Richard Joseph , et al
Infineum UK Ltd.
Law Department
Milton Hill
P.O. Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Hart, Richard Joseph , et al
Infineum UK Ltd. Law Department Milton Hill, P.O. Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Former [1999/11]Hart, Richard Joseph (GB) , et al
Infineum UK Ltd, Law Department, Milton Hill Business and Technology Centre, P.O. Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Former [1997/41]Zeestraten, Albertus Wilhelmus Joannes , et al
Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date95943208.918.12.1995
[1997/41]
WO1995EP05129
Priority number, dateUS1994035980620.12.1994         Original published format: US 359806
[1997/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9619505
Date:27.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0799251
Date:08.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996
[1997/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0799251
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08F8/32, C10M145/14, C10M149/02
[1997/41]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STERNPOLYMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[1997/41]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING STAR POLYMER COMPOSITIONS[1997/41]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS POLYMERES A STRUCTURE EN ETOILE[1997/41]
Entry into regional phase19.06.1997National basic fee paid 
19.06.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
13.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
30.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
13.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1999Fee for grant paid
11.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0603955  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DA] 1 * page 5, line 16 - line 24; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]US5338802  (DUBOIS DONN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 40 - line 68; claims 1-14 *;
 [A]WO8703890  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-25 *;
 [A]EP0541178  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]US5360564  (SUTHERLAND ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 13; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]US4857599  (TOMALIA DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0029622  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-20 *;
 [A]EP0459588  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-13 *