EP0809787 - DEPTH SENSING EXPENDABLE OCEANOGRAPHIC PROBE WITH NO EXTRA DATA CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/49] | DEPTH SENSING EXPENDABLE OCEANOGRAPHIC PROBES | ||
[1999/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIPPICAN, INC. Seven Barnabas Road Marion, MA 02738-1499 / US | [1997/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHALEN, Mark, E. 3 Noyes Avenue Mattapoisett, MA 02739 / US | 02 /
ELGIN, Randall, H. 799 Main Street Wareham, MA 02571 / US | 03 /
BALBONI, Michael, J. 79 Green Gate Lane Wareham, MA 02571 / US | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95943603.1 | 20.11.1995 | [1997/49] | WO1995US15378 | Priority number, date | US19940349607 | 05.12.1994 Original published format: US 349607 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618082 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809787 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809787 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01C13/00 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
G01C13/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/49] | Title | German: | TIEFENMESSENDE OZEANOGRAPHISCHE EINWEGPROBE OHNE EXTRA DATENKANAL | [1999/08] | English: | DEPTH SENSING EXPENDABLE OCEANOGRAPHIC PROBE WITH NO EXTRA DATA CHANNEL | [1999/08] | French: | SONDE OCEANOGRAPHIQUE EXTENSIBLE DESTINEE A DETERMINER LA PROFONDEUR SANS CANAL DE DONNEES EXTRA | [1999/08] |
Former [1997/49] | OZEANOGRAPHISCHE EINWEGPROBEN ZUR TIEFENMESSUNG | ||
Former [1997/49] | DEPTH SENSING EXPENDABLE OCEANOGRAPHIC PROBES | ||
Former [1997/49] | SONDES OCEANOGRAPHIQUES EXTENSIBLES DESTINEES A DETERMINER LA PROFONDEUR | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 02.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2000 | BE | 05.01.2000 | CH | 05.01.2000 | ES | 05.01.2000 | GR | 05.01.2000 | IT | 05.01.2000 | LI | 05.01.2000 | NL | 05.01.2000 | SE | 05.01.2000 | DK | 05.04.2000 | PT | 05.04.2000 | DE | 06.04.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 05.01.2000 | |
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 10.04.2000 | |
LI | 10.04.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5209112 (MCCOY KIM O [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X] - I.E.SHEPARD ET AL., "A silt-salinity-depth profiling instrument", MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL, LONDON GB, (197905), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 185 - 190, XP002000344 [X] 1 * page 185, column R, line 11 - page 186, column L, line 24; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/002029407901200501 | [A] - ELGIN R H, "An evaluation of XCTD performance with design improvements", OCEANS 94. OCEANS ENGINEERING FOR TODAY'S TECHNOLOGY AND TOMORROW'S PRESERVATION. PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.94CH3472-8), PROCEEDINGS OF OCEANS'94, BREST, FRANCE, 13-16 SEPT. 1994, ISBN 0-7803-2056-5, 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages I/402 - 7 vol.1, XP002000345 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/OCEANS.1994.363868 | [A] - EAST A M, "The prediction of sonar ray paths", SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY, JULY 1971, UK, ISSN 0039-8047, no. 13, pages 1 - 6, XP002000346 [A] 1 * page 5, column R, line 6 - page 6, column R, line 33 * |