Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0793754

EP0793754 - TENSIONLESS PIER FOUNDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henderson, Allan P..
5919 mohawk Drive
Bakersfield, CA 93308 / US
For all designated states
Patrick, Miller B.
8616 Beau Maison Way Bakersfield
California 9331 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]For all designated states
Henderson, Allan P..
5919 mohawk Drive
Bakersfield, CA 93308 / US
For all designated states
Patrick, Miller B.
8616 Beau Maison Way
Bakersfield, California 9331 / US
Former [1997/37]For all designated states
Henderson, Allan P..
5919 mohawk Drive
Bakersfield, CA 93308 / US
For all designated states
Patrick, Miller B.
5808 Baywood
Bakersfield, CA 93309 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/37]
Representative(s)Zinnecker, Armin , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Zinnecker, Armin , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Former [2004/05]Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Former [1997/37]Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing.
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95943652.817.11.1995
[1997/37]
WO1995US15693
Priority number, dateUS1994034693523.11.1994         Original published format: US 346935
[1997/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9616233
Date:30.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0793754
Date:10.09.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0793754
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E02D5/38, E02D7/28, E02D27/12, E02D5/58, E02D27/42
[2000/02]
Former International [1997/37]E02D5/38, E02D7/28, E02D27/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/37]
TitleGerman:SPANNUNGSFREIE PFEILERGRÜNDUNG[1997/37]
English:TENSIONLESS PIER FOUNDATION[1997/37]
French:FONDATIONS SANS TENSION POUR PILIERS[1997/37]
Entry into regional phase16.05.1997National basic fee paid 
16.05.1997Search fee paid 
16.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/37]
19.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2003Fee for grant paid
03.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.01.2004
IT28.01.2004
NL28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
PT28.06.2004
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR28.01.2004
NL28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
Former [2006/12]NL28.01.2004
DK28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
Former [2005/02]DK28.04.2004
SE28.04.2004
Former [2004/40]SE28.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE2758489  (BIARMATO) [X] 28,45 * page 6, line 23 - page 8, line 3; figure 4 * [A] 33,42 [Y] 29;
 [YA]FR1463696  (SIEGWART) [Y] 29 * page 2, column R, lines 3-26; figure . * [A] 34,36;
 [Y]JPS55122916  ;
 [Y]JPS59150830  ;
 [A]FR2030478  (NIPPON CONCRETE) [A] 28,32,37 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 17; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]JPS61233131
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801126), vol. 004, no. 171, Database accession no. (M - 044), & JP55122916 A 19800922 (KUROSAWA KENSETSU KK) [Y] 30,35,38,39,44 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841226), vol. 008, no. 284, Database accession no. (M - 348), & JP59150830 A 19840829 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) [Y] 30,35,38,39,44 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870307), vol. 011, no. 076, Database accession no. (M - 569), & JP61233131 A 19861017 (DAINICHI CONCRETE KOGYO KK) [A] 30,35,38-41,44 * abstract *
International search[X]US3382680  ;
 [Y]US3963056  ;
 [Y]US3559412  ;
 [A]US4842447