Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0775278

EP0775278 - DIAPHRAGM VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RUPNIK S.r.l.
Via Ceccardi 2/11
16121 Genova / IT
[2000/35]
Former [1997/22]For all designated states
RUPNIK S.P.A.
Via Ceccardi, 2
16121 Genova / IT
Inventor(s)01 / RUPNIK, Carlo
Corso Firenze, 46/10A
I-16136 Genova / IT
02 / RUPNIK, Giorgio
Via Macaggi, 19
I-16121 Genova / IT
[1997/22]
Representative(s)Perani, Aurelio
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[2008/38]
Former [2000/26]Perani, Aurelio
Jacobacci & Perani, Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Former [1997/22]Ferroni, Filippo
Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A., Via Visconti di Modrone 7
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95944009.026.07.1995
[1997/22]
WO1995EP02957
Priority number, dateIT1994MI0172608.08.1994         Original published format: IT MI941726
[1997/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9605456
Date:22.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0775278
Date:28.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0775278
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16K7/12
[1997/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/22]
TitleGerman:MEMBRANVENTIL[1997/22]
English:DIAPHRAGM VALVE[1997/22]
French:VANNE A MEMBRANE[1999/47]
Former [1997/22]ROBINET A MEMBRANE
Entry into regional phase04.02.1997National basic fee paid 
04.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/22]
22.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
07.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.1999Fee for grant paid
24.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199905   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[XA]GB376702  (AN RUBINETTO TORRIANO SOC) [X] 1,2,9 * page 1, line 93 - page 2, line 49; figure 1 * [A] 4;
 [A]GB2101712  (KIM PRODUCTION LTD [IL]) [A] 1,4,6,7,9 * page 1, line 115 - page 2, line 34; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2026140  (SAUNDERS VALVE CO LTD) [A] 1,4,9 * page 2, line 19 - line 106; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]CH354640  (SAUNDERS VALVE CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB1138088  (GRINNELL CORP) [A] 1,9 * figures 1,4 *