Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0797749

EP0797749 - SEGMENTED BULKHEAD LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.05.2001 [2001/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Thomas, E.
57 Tudor Lane
Manchester, CT 06040 / US
02 / MADDEN, Thomas, J.
108 Huntington Drive
Vernon, CT 06066 / US
03 / SODERQUIST, Robert, W.
31 Winthrop Road
Windsor, CT 06095 / US
[1997/40]
Representative(s)Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]Leckey, David Herbert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date95944029.817.11.1995
[1997/40]
WO1995US15095
Priority number, dateUS1994035659915.12.1994         Original published format: US 356599
[1997/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9618851
Date:20.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0797749
Date:01.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996
[1997/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0797749
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search reportEP20.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:F23R3/10, F23R3/28
[1997/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/40]
TitleGerman:GETEILTE SCHUTZPLATTE FÜR DIE STIRNWAND EINER TURBINENBRENNKAMMER[1997/40]
English:SEGMENTED BULKHEAD LINER[1997/40]
French:REVETEMENT SEGMENTE DE CLOISON[1997/40]
Entry into regional phase15.07.1997National basic fee paid 
15.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/40]
27.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2000Fee for grant paid
25.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2247522  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO9221919  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2107448  (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1 * figures 5-7 *