Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878006

EP0878006 - A CD REPLAY DEVICE IN A PERSONAL COMPUTER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/47]A CD REPLAY DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME
[1999/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
For all designated states
Kinoshita, Hidenori
4-23-27, Tsukushino
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Iwata, Shuichi
52-14-105, Enokigaoka, Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KINOSHITA, Hidenori
4-23-27, Tsukushino
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / IWATA, Shuichi
52-14-105, Enokigaoka, Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Ling, Christopher John
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Ling, Christopher John
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date95944580.029.12.1995
[1998/47]
WO1995US17100
Priority number, dateJP1995005387914.03.1995         Original published format: JP 5387995
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9628821
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0878006
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996
[1998/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0878006
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:G11B19/02, G11B19/12, G11B19/06
[1998/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1998/47]
TitleGerman:CD-WIEDERGABEGERÄT IN EINEM PC UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[1999/23]
English:A CD REPLAY DEVICE IN A PERSONAL COMPUTER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME[1999/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE DE DISQUES COMPACTS DANS UN ORDINATEUR PERSONEL ET PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER CE DISPOSITIF[1999/23]
Former [1998/47]CD-WIEDERGABEGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR
Former [1998/47]A CD REPLAY DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME
Former [1998/47]DISPOSITIF DE RELECTURE DE DISQUES COMPACTS ET PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER CE DISPOSITIF
Entry into regional phase29.08.1997National basic fee paid 
29.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.08.1997Examination requested  [1998/47]
03.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1999Fee for grant paid
01.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR23.02.2000
[2002/32]
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS61271660  ;
 [Y]JPS6055553  ;
 [A]US4939601  (ENDO HIROTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 15 * * claims 14,19 *;
 [A]GB2234105  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 4 * * column 6, line 3 - column 8, line 12 *;
 [A]JPS63197047  ;
 [A]JPS63187446  ;
 [A]JPH03168971  ;
 [A]JPS5798150  ;
 [XP]JPH07282527
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870423), vol. 011, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 570), [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850802), vol. 009, no. 186, Database accession no. (P - 377), [Y] 1-13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881215), vol. 012, no. 480, Database accession no. (P - 801), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881208), vol. 012, no. 468, Database accession no. (P - 797), [A] 1,2,7-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911023), vol. 015, no. 418, Database accession no. (P - 1266), [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820918), vol. 006, no. 183, Database accession no. (P - 143), [A] 7-10 * abstract *
 [XP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 010, [XP] 1-6 * abstract *