blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0843772 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0843772



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 265
24.01.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.02.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.12.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.12.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.12.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.11.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 7
03.09.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 5
27.08.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
25.08.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.08.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.05.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.05.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
25.01.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
25.01.2001 Description Search / examination 10
25.01.2001 Drawings Search / examination 1
25.01.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.01.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 18
21.11.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
14.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
10.07.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.07.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.01.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
18.12.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.11.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 7
16.04.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.02.1998 Claims Search / examination 8
10.02.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.02.1998 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
10.02.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.02.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 14
22.07.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
22.07.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
23.04.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.02.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.02.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 43
20.02.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 48