blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0843772


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.03.2003  [2003/11]
01.02.2002 (Expected) grant published on  20.03.2002  [2002/12]
16.01.2002 Renewal fee
07.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
29.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
02.05.2001 Communication of intention to grant
14.02.2001 Examination report or reply
28.11.2000 Renewal fee
17.11.2000 Examination report or reply
07.07.2000 First examination report
04.07.2000 Examination report or reply
30.11.1999 Renewal fee
19.11.1999 Supplementary search report published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
18.12.1998 Change - representative published on  03.02.1999 [1999/05]
04.12.1998 Renewal fee
09.04.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.05.1998 [1998/22]
09.04.1998 Request for examination filed published on  27.05.1998 [1998/22]
23.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
16.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
10.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.1997 Renewal fee
19.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
24.04.1996 PCT data prior to European publication