Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0843772

EP0843772 - CUTTING TOOL FOR DRILLING CONCRETE, AGGREGATE OR MASONRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ANJANAPPA, Muniswamappa
2004 Eliza Dorsey Lane
Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US
02 / CROSBY, Stephen, R.
7 Twig Court
White Hall, MD 21161 / US
03 / TIMMONS, Russell, M.
1715 Greenspring Drive
Lutherville, MD 21093 / US
04 / WILLIAMS, John, D.
708 South Lynn Street
Champaign, IL 61820 / US
05 / BLUDIS, Thomas, Trevor
310 Greenlow Road
Baltimore, MD 21228 / US
06 / KOEHLER, Udo
160 Irving Road
York, PA 17403 / US
[1998/22]
Representative(s)Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe
European Group Headquarters
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Former [1998/22]Stagg, Diana Christine , et al
Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road
Birmingham B42 1BP / GB
Application number, filing date95944616.215.12.1995
[1998/22]
WO1995US16280
Priority number, dateUS1995051358610.08.1995         Original published format: US 513586
[1998/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9706338
Date:20.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0843772
Date:27.05.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997
[1998/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0843772
Date:20.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.02.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/36, B23B51/02, B22C15/02, B21K5/02
[1998/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/22]
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDWERKZEUG ZUM BOHREN VON BETON, AGGLOMERATEN ODER MAUERWERK[1998/22]
English:CUTTING TOOL FOR DRILLING CONCRETE, AGGREGATE OR MASONRY[1998/22]
French:OUTIL DE COUPE SERVANT A PERCER DU BETON, DE L'AGGLOMERE OU DE LA MACONNERIE[1998/22]
Entry into regional phase06.02.1998National basic fee paid 
06.02.1998Search fee paid 
06.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/22]
10.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
03.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2001Fee for grant paid
29.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0556648  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * column 2, line 30 - line 51 *;
 [A]US4979984  (ANDERSON LINWOOD R [US]) [A] 24-28 * column A *
International search[X]US2902260  (TILDEN CARL V);
 [Y]US2524570  (ORVILLE PHIPPS);
 [X]US3198270  (HORVATH PAUL M);
 [X]US4503920  (CLEMENT BURKE [US]);
 [Y]US5269387  (NANCE LARRY S [US]);
 [A]US2650071  (RASSIEUR THEODORE E);
 [A]US2889138  (WILHELM HAGLUND DIDRIK);
 [A]US2999309  (KUZMICK JEROME F, et al);
 [A]US3765496  (FLORES M, et al);
 [A]US4271114  (OHNO JOHN M);
 [A]US4286677  (GUEX RAYMOND);
 [A]US4906294  (VON HAAS RAINER [DE], et al)
by applicantUS19940354349