Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0795246

EP0795246 - INTELLIGENT CALL PROCESSING PLATFORM FOR HOME TELEPHONE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 26.11.2008  [2008/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOICE CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC.
Suite 100, 14140 Midway Road
Dallas, TX 75244 / US
[1997/38]
Inventor(s)01 / FOSTER, Peter, J.
3925 Bryn Mawr
Dallas, TX 75225 / US
02 / BAREIS, Bernard, F.
724 Sunkist Lane
Plano, Texas 75025 / US
[1998/37]
Former [1997/38]01 / FOSTER, Peter, J.
3925 Bryn Mawr
Dallas, TX 75225 / US
02 / BAREIS, Bernard, F.
213, 2240 Tarpley Road
Carrollton, TX 750066 / US
Representative(s)van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/48]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/30]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
International Octrooibureau B.V., P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/38]Williamson, Brian , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date95944620.404.12.1995
[1997/38]
WO1995US16391
Priority number, dateUS1994034878802.12.1994         Original published format: US 348788
[1997/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9618258
Date:13.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0795246
Date:17.09.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996
[1997/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.12.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/64, H04M3/58, H04M1/72, H04M1/66, H04M1/65, H04M1/57, H04M11/00
[2000/17]
Former International [1997/38]H04M1/64, H04M3/58
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/38]
TitleGerman:INTELLIGENTE ANRUFVERARBEITUNGSPLATTFORM FÜR EIN HEIMTELEFONSYSTEM[1997/38]
English:INTELLIGENT CALL PROCESSING PLATFORM FOR HOME TELEPHONE SYSTEM[1997/38]
French:UNITE INTELLIGENTE DE TRAITEMENT D'APPELS POUR SYSTEME TELEPHONIQUE DOMESTIQUE[1997/38]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1997National basic fee paid 
01.07.1997Search fee paid 
01.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/38]
24.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/06]
30.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:07.01.2005Request for further processing filed
07.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.01.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4578540  (BORG KEVIN E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,23,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 59 * * column 3, line 1 - line 23 * * column 4, line 19 - line 30 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 54 * * column 6, line 4 - line 59 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 2 * * column 9, line 57 - column 11, line 59 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4,6-20,22,25;
 [Y]US5220595  (UEHARA KENSUKE [JP]) [Y] 3,4,6-20,22,25 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - line 37 * * column 3, line 1 - line 26 * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 4 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5062133  (MELROSE THOMAS O [US]) [X] 1-3,5-14,16,17,20,22-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - line 44 * * column 3, line 6 - line 54 * * column 5, line 36 - column 11, line 34 * * figure 1 *;
 [XA]US5127045  (CRAGUN DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 3,5,6,8-14,16-20,22-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 24 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,2;
 [X]US4885766  (YASUOKA NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10-14,16,17,20,23 * column 1, line 45 - line 49 * * column 2, line 25 - line 30 * * column 4, line 27 - column 6, line 42 * * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [XA]US4674115  (KALEITA DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,12,13,16-20,23,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 64 * * column 5, line 4 - line 64 * [A] 3,5,22;
 [X]US5056132  (COLEMAN EDWARD R [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-10,12,16,17,20,23,24 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 48 * * column 8, line 56 - column 10, line 60 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4788714  (HASHIMOTO KAZUO [JP]) [X] 3,5,6,10-13,16,20,23,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 30 * * column 7, line 42 - line 58 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [PX]US5434906  (ROBINSON MICHAEL J [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,6-9,12-16,20,21,23,24 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 25 * * column 6, line 37 - line 54 * * figure 6 *
International search[XP]US5434906  (ROBINSON MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [XP]US5452340  (ENGELBECK GEORGE E [US], et al);
 [X]US4885766  (YASUOKA NORIO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5349638  (PITRODA SATYAN G [US], et al);
 [A]US5200987  (GRAY WILLIAM F [US]);
 [A]US5353336  (HOU MICHAEL M [US], et al);
 [A]US5222125  (CRESWELL CARROLL W [US], et al)