Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0723311

EP0723311 - Electrical connector for contacting a device with abutting contacts, especially a mobile telephone handset [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TYCO Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[2001/12]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
Former [1996/30]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hoolhorst, Albert
Romanlaan 8
NL-4527 BE Aardenburg / NL
[1996/30]
Representative(s)Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach (SG) / CH
Application number, filing date96100126.005.01.1996
[1996/30]
Priority number, dateDE199510165118.01.1995         Original published format: DE 19501651
[1996/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0723311
Date:24.07.1996
Language:DE
[1996/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0723311
Date:06.08.1997
[1997/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0723311
Date:21.03.2001
Language:DE
[2001/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/24
[1996/30]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/30]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder zur Kontaktierung eines mit Flachkontakten versehenen Gerätes, insbesondere eines Mobiltelefon-Handapparates[1996/30]
English:Electrical connector for contacting a device with abutting contacts, especially a mobile telephone handset[1996/30]
French:Connecteur électrique pour contacter d'un appareil avec des contacts plats, en particulier pour un combiné téléphonique mobile[1996/30]
Examination procedure18.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/47]
11.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2000Fee for grant paid
21.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT21.03.2001
DK21.06.2001
SE21.06.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2003/46]DK21.06.2001
SE21.06.2001
Former [2002/05]SE21.06.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0584416  (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US5306163  (ASAKAWA KAZUSHIGE [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 2 - line 6; figures 1,6,7 *