Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0716416

EP0716416 - Optical disc with metallic reflective layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1996/24]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ikeda, Jiro, c/o Patents Div. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Yanagisawa, Yoshitake, c/o Patents Div. Sony Corp.
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[1996/24]
Representative(s)Boden, Keith McMurray , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Boden, Keith McMurray , et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [1996/24]Purvis, William Michael Cameron , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96100275.518.09.1992
[1996/24]
Priority number, dateJP1991024609125.09.1991         Original published format: JP 24609191
[1996/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0716416
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0716416
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/24
[1996/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB [1996/24]
TitleGerman:Optische Platte mit metallischer Reflektionsschicht[1996/24]
English:Optical disc with metallic reflective layer[1996/24]
French:Disque optique avec une couche métallique réfléchissante[1996/24]
Examination procedure26.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
29.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92308535.1  / EP0534693
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8201098  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 34 * * page 7, line 1 - line 14 * * page 9, line 4 - line 19 * * page 23, line 25 - line 26 * * page 30, line 3 - line 4 *;
 [X]WO8802168  (UNISYS CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 7 - line 28 *;
 [X]EP0064777  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4956216  (HAUSLER ALFONS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS58196641  ;
 [A]JPH01302552
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840228), vol. 008, no. 045, Database accession no. (P - 257), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900222), vol. 014, no. 098, Database accession no. (P - 1011), [A] 1 * abstract *