Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0726111

EP0726111 - Multiple die station forging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE NATIONAL MACHINERY COMPANY
161 Greenfield Street Tiffin
Ohio 44883 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/33]For all designated states
THE NATIONAL MACHINERY COMPANY
161 Greenfield Street
Tiffin Ohio 44883 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Genet, Steve
68 Earl Street
Tiffin, Ohio 44883 / US
02 / McClellan, Richard J.
2774 S. Twp. Rd. 1174
Tiffin, Ohio 44883 / US
[1996/33]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/33]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96100298.711.01.1996
[1996/33]
Priority number, dateUS1995038532408.02.1995         Original published format: US 385324
[1996/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0726111
Date:14.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0726111
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:B21K27/04
[1996/33]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/33]
TitleGerman:Mehrstufige Umformmaschine[1996/33]
English:Multiple die station forging machine[1996/33]
French:Machine de formage à postes multiples[1996/33]
Examination procedure23.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/13]
14.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2001Fee for grant paid
16.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE05.12.2001
CH05.12.2001
FR05.12.2001
LI05.12.2001
GB05.03.2002
ES27.06.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2004/04]BE05.12.2001
CH05.12.2001
LI05.12.2001
GB05.03.2002
ES27.06.2002
Former [2003/17]BE05.12.2001
CH05.12.2001
LI05.12.2001
GB05.03.2002
Former [2003/06]BE05.12.2001
CH05.12.2001
LI05.12.2001
Former [2003/01]CH05.12.2001
LI05.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3714872  (KIESERLING & ALBRECHT [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 7; figure - *;
 [DA]US4898017  (HITE WILLIAM H [US], et al) [DA] 3,4,6 * figure 7 *;
 [A]US2728267  (SCHAEFFER JOSEPH M, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 6, line 32 - line 64; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]GB967056  (SMERALOVY ZD Y)