Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0728979

EP0728979 - Sealing connection between a plastic pipe and a connecting piece made of metal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Franz Viegener II GmbH & Co. KG.
Ennester Weg 9
57439 Attendorn / DE
[2000/14]
Former [1996/35]For all designated states
Viegener, Franz II
Ennester Weg 9
57439 Attendorn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Viegener, Walter
Biekhoferstrasse 26
D-57439 Attendorn / DE
[1996/44]
Former [1996/35]01 / Vliegener, Walter
Biekhoferstrasse 26
D-57439 Attendorn / DE
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
D-33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date96100451.213.01.1996
[1996/35]
Priority number, dateDE1995203019U23.02.1995         Original published format: DE 29503019 U
[1996/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0728979
Date:28.08.1996
Language:DE
[1996/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0728979
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16L33/207
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1996/35]
TitleGerman:Abdichtende Verbindung eines Kunststoffrohres mit einem aus Metall gefertigten Anschlussstück[1996/35]
English:Sealing connection between a plastic pipe and a connecting piece made of metal[1996/35]
French:Raccord étanche entre un tuyau en matière plastique et une pièce de raccordement fabriquée en métal[1996/35]
Examination procedure24.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/51]
14.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2000Fee for grant paid
11.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Request for further processing for:16.07.1999Request for further processing filed
16.07.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.07.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1079136  (ERMETO SA) [A] 1-4,7,9 * Seite 4, rechte Spalte, Absatz 3 * * figures 9,10 *;
 [A]US4498691  (COOKE HORISE M [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7 * column 1, line 8 - line 19 * * column 3, line 23 - line 68 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 25 * * column 6, line 27 - line 36 * * claims 1,12,14 * * figures 1,2,10,11,15 *;
 [A]DE1425426  (AEROQUIP) [A] 1,7,9 * column 1, line 1 - line 28 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0073048  (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 14 - line 29 * * figure 1 *