Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0723017

EP0723017 - Transketolase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [1996/30]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Ralf-Michael, Dr.
Gräfensteinstr. 14
D-67434 Neustadt / DE
02 / Stitt, Marc, Prof. Dr.
Mohrhardtgässchen 1
D-69221 Dossenheim / DE
03 / Sonnewald, Uwe, Dr.
Martha-Brautzsch-Str. 7a
D-06467 Hoym / DE
[1996/30]
Application number, filing date96100458.713.01.1996
[1996/30]
Priority number, dateDE199510190623.01.1995         Original published format: DE 19501906
[1996/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0723017
Date:24.07.1996
Language:DE
[1996/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0723017
Date:27.09.2000
[2000/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/54, C12N9/10, C12Q1/48, A01N3/00, C12N1/21, C12N5/10
[1996/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1996/30]
TitleGerman:Transketolase[1996/30]
English:Transketolase[1996/30]
French:Transcétolase[1996/30]
Examination procedure29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/03]
22.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
17.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
21.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]US5168056  (FROST JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-10,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]  MCCOOL B A ET AL, "CLONING OF HUMAN TRANSKETOLASE CDNAS AND COMPARISON OF THE NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF THE CODING REGION IN WERNICKE-KORSAKOFF AND NON-WERNICKE-KORSAKOFF INDIVIDUALS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, (19930115), vol. 268, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1397 - 1404, XP002023965 [A] 1-10,12 * the whole document *
 [A]  ABEDINIA M ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE AND PREDICTED AMINO ACID SEQUENCE OF A CDNA CLONE ENCODING PART OF HUMAN TRANSKETOLASE", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,US,ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, (19920331), vol. 183, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1159 - 1166, XP002023964 [A] 1-10,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(05)80312-2
 [PA]  BERNACCHIA G ET AL, "THE TRANSKETOLASE GENE FAMILY OF THE RESURRECTION PLANT CRATEROSTIGMA PLANTAGINEUM: DIFFERENTIAL EXPRESSION DURING THE REHYDRATION PHASE", EMBO JOURNAL,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, (19950201), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 610 - 618, XP002915404 [PA] 1-10,12 * the whole document *
 [A]  SUNDSTRÖM M. ET AL., "Yeast TKL1 gene encodes a transketolase that is required for efficient glycolysis and biosynthesis of aromatic amino acids", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19931115), vol. 268, no. 32, pages 24346 - 24352, XP000919119 [A] 1-10,12 * the whole document *
 [A]  SPRENGER G. A., "Nucleotide sequence of the Escherichia coli K-12 transketolase (tkt) gene", BIOCHIMICA AND BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1993), vol. 1216, no. 2, pages 307 - 310, XP000916151 [A] 1-10,12 * the whole document *