Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0723975

EP0723975 - Chemical composition, redispersible in aqueous media, containing a copolymer and a protective colloid, its aqueous polymer dispersion, methods for their production and the use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elotex AG
6203 Sempach-Station / CH
[1996/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Koelliker, Robert, Dr.
Gewerbestrasse 6b
CH-6207 Nottwil / CH
02 / Bächler, Harald
Grenzweg 6
CH-5533 Buchs / CH
[1996/31]
Representative(s)Hagemann, Heinrich , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/31]Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date96100581.616.01.1996
[1996/31]
Priority number, dateDE199510243526.01.1995         Original published format: DE 19502435
[1996/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0723975
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0723975
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/24, C08F12/08, C08F20/10, C08L57/00, C08J3/12, C04B24/26, C09D5/02, C09D5/34
[1996/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/31]
TitleGerman:Chemische Zusammensetzung, redispergierbar im wässrigen Milieu enthaltend ein Copolymer und ein Schutzkolloid, ihre wässrige Polymerdispersion, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[1996/31]
English:Chemical composition, redispersible in aqueous media, containing a copolymer and a protective colloid, its aqueous polymer dispersion, methods for their production and the use thereof[1996/31]
French:Composition chimique redispersable dans un milieu aqueux contenant un copolymère et un colloide protecteur, sa dispersion aqueuse de polymère, procédé de sa production et son utilisation[1996/31]
Examination procedure24.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/38]
03.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.11.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.1999Fee for grant paid
24.02.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.02.2000   
Wacker Polymer Systems Gmbh & Co.KG
Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24
84489 Burghausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schuderer, Michael, et al
Wacker Chemie AG
Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/14]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2000   
Wacker Polymer Systems Gmbh & Co.KG
Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24
84489 Burghausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schuderer, Michael, Dr., et al
Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
17.03.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.07.2002Date of oral proceedings
02.10.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.10.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
06.01.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/09]
Appeal following opposition21.11.2002Appeal received No.  T1150/02
03.02.2003Statement of grounds filed
07.12.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE12.05.1999
ES12.05.1999
IT12.05.1999
AT16.01.2003
SE17.01.2003
DK31.01.2003
NL01.08.2003
CH31.01.2004
LI31.01.2004
[2008/06]
Former [2004/51]BE12.05.1999
ES12.05.1999
AT16.01.2003
SE17.01.2003
DK31.01.2003
NL01.08.2003
CH31.01.2004
LI31.01.2004
Former [2004/23]BE12.05.1999
ES12.05.1999
AT16.01.2003
SE17.01.2003
DK31.01.2003
NL01.08.2003
Former [2004/03]BE12.05.1999
ES12.05.1999
AT16.01.2003
SE17.01.2003
NL01.08.2003
Former [2004/02]BE12.05.1999
ES12.05.1999
SE17.01.2003
NL01.08.2003
Former [2003/41]BE12.05.1999
ES12.05.1999
SE17.01.2003
Former [2002/26]BE12.05.1999
ES12.05.1999
Former [2000/23]BE12.05.1999
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0632096  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH) [A] 1,2,4,5,8,11,23,24;
 [A]EP0477900  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH) [A] 1-3,8,11,23,24;
 [A]EP0601518  (AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.) [A] 1-5,8,11,18-20,23,24;
 [A]US5252704  (BRIGHT ET AL.) [A] 1-5,8,11,18-20,23,24;
 [A]DE3143071  (BASF AG) [A] 1-5,8,11,18-20,23,24;
 [DA]EP0062106  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH) [DA] 1-5,8,11,12,14,18,22,23;
 [DA]EP0538571  (H¨LS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [DA] 1-5,8,11,12,14,18,23,24
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1,2,4,8,11,12,15,18,23,24
ExaminationJPS58162611