Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0724189

EP0724189 - Image selecting apparatus for photographic printer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD.
579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi
Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd.
579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP
Former [1996/31]For all designated states
NORITSU KOKI CO. LTD.
579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken 640 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okazaki, Hiroki
c/o Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd., Umehara 579-1
Wakayama 579-1, Wakayama-ken / JP
02 / Masutani, Hironori
c/o Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd., Umehara 579-1
Wakayama 579-1, Wakayama-ken / JP
03 / Yamada, Junji
c/o Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd., Umehara 579-1
Wakayama 579-1, Wakayama-ken / JP
[1996/31]
Representative(s)Petersen, Frank , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/31]Petersen, Frank , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Petersen, Patentanwälte, Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date96100943.824.01.1996
[1996/31]
Priority number, dateJP1995001162327.01.1995         Original published format: JP 1162395
JP1995001265130.01.1995         Original published format: JP 1265195
JP1995003226121.02.1995         Original published format: JP 3226195
JP1995007118529.03.1995         Original published format: JP 7118595
[1996/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0724189
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0724189
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:G03B27/62
[1996/31]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/31]
TitleGerman:Bildauswahlvorrichtung für ein photographisches Kopiergerät[1996/31]
English:Image selecting apparatus for photographic printer[1996/31]
French:Dispositif de sélection d'image pour une imprimante photographique[1996/31]
Examination procedure25.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/47]
27.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2002Fee for grant paid
15.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH11.09.2002
IT11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
[2008/06]
Former [2003/31]CH11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[DXY]US4994850  (IMAMURA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [DX] 1-6 * column 3, line 41 - column 7, line 29; figures 1-10 * [Y] 7-10;
 [Y]EP0308967  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 7-10 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 42; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3642821  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column W *;
 [A]JPH01200348
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891110), vol. 013, no. 499, Database accession no. (P - 957), [A] 1,7,10 * abstract *