EP0722163 - Electronic musical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Hideo c/o Yamaha Corp., 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Masahiro c/o Yamaha Corp., 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/29] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101444.6 | 12.11.1991 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | JP19900314690 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31469090 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0722163 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0722163 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722163 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G10H7/00, G10H5/00 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
F16H57/0415 (EP,US);
G10H5/00 (KR);
F16H57/04 (EP,US);
F16H57/0421 (EP,US);
G10H5/007 (EP,US);
G10H7/004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/29] | Title | German: | Elektronische Musikvorrichtung | [1996/29] | English: | Electronic musical apparatus | [1996/29] | French: | Dispositif musical électronique | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91119279.7 / EP0486925 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4554857 (NISHIMOTO TETSUO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 65 - column 9, line 24; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0397149 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 2,5,8-14 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 5 * * column 10, line 25 - column 12, line 3; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0393701 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 2,5,10,11 * column 13, line 3 - line 58 * * column 17, line 51 - column 18, line 14; figures 13,20 *; | [A]WO8602791 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) [A] 15-18 * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 9 *; | [A]US4833962 (MAZZOLA GUERINO B [CH], et al) [A] 15-17 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 38; figure 1 *; | [A]US4768086 (PAIST ROGER M [US]) [A] 15-17 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]WO8402416 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [A] 15-18 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 3; figures 1,2 * | [A] - ZANDER H, "DER PERSONALCOMPUTER ALS UNIVERSALES HILFSMITTEL IN LABOR UND STUDIO (VII) 7. DER PC ALS MUSIKMASCHINE", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, (19890101), vol. 43, no. 3, page 156/157, XP000104816 [A] 15-17 * page 157, column L, line 20 - line 50 * |