EP0725383 - Pattern adaptation system using tree scheme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinoda, Koichi c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101520.3 | 02.02.1996 | [1996/32] | Priority number, date | JP19950039073 | 03.02.1995 Original published format: JP 3907395 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0725383 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0725383 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725383 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/14 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
G10L15/144 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/07] | G10L5/06, G10L3/00 | ||
Former IPC [1996/32] | G10L5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/32] | Title | German: | System zur Musteranpassung mittels einer Baumstruktur | [1996/32] | English: | Pattern adaptation system using tree scheme | [1996/32] | French: | Système d'adaptation d'éléments de référence utilisant une structure arborescente | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 29.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - KOSAKA ET AL., "Speaker-independent speech recognition based on tree-structured speaker clustering", COMPUTER SPEECH AND LANGUAGE, UK, (199601), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 55 - 74, XP002049794 [PX] 1,3-5,8-10 * paragraph [02.4] - paragraph [02.5] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/csla.1996.0004 | [A] - KOSAKA ET AL., "Tree-structured speaker clustering for speaker-independent continuous speech recognition", PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING (ICSLP '94), YOKOHAMA, JP, (19940918), vol. 3, pages 1375 - 1378, XP002049795 [A] 1,8-10 * page 1375 * | [A] - KOSAKA ET AL., "Tree-structured speaker clustering for fast speaker adaptation", PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP '94), ADELAIDE, SA, AU, (19940419), vol. 1, pages 245 - 248, XP002049796 [A] 1,10 * paragraph [03.4] - paragraph [0005] * |