EP0730251 - Non-contact type IC card and system therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/36] | Non-contact type IC card, system and data transmission method therefor | ||
[2001/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-2-3, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC SEMICONDUCTOR SOFTWARE CO., LTD. 1-17, Chuo 3-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-2-3, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC SEMICONDUCTOR SOFTWARE CO., LTD. 1-17, Chuo 3-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsubara, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitsubishi Electric Semicond. Software Co., Ltd., 1-17, Chuo 3-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/36] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102276.1 | 15.02.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | JP19950044315 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: JP 4431595 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730251 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730251 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730251 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K7/08, G06K7/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
G06K19/0701 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/36] | G06K19/07, G06K7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/36] | Title | German: | Kontaktlose IC-Karte und System dafür | [2001/32] | English: | Non-contact type IC card and system therefor | [2001/32] | French: | Carte à circuit intégré sans contact et système pour une telle carte | [2001/32] |
Former [1996/36] | Kontaktlose IC-Karte, System und Übertragungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [1996/36] | Non-contact type IC card, system and data transmission method therefor | ||
Former [1996/36] | Carte à circuit intégré sans contact, système et méthode de transmission pour une telle carte | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01120575.4 / EP1170696 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0308964 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 41 - line 53; figure 5; claim 9 *; | [A]US4818855 (MONGEON RONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 15 * * figures 3,7,9 * * claims 14-16 *; | [A]EP0377257 (NEDAP NV [NL]) [A] 10 * column 2, line 40 - line 48 ** claim 1 *; | [A]US4963887 (KAWASHIMA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5347263 (CARROLL GARY T [US], et al) [A] 3,6-8 * column 7, line 9 - line 15 * * column 10, line 39 - line 52 * * claim 11 * |