Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733349

EP0733349 - Hyperextension orthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otto Bock Orthopädische Industrie Besitz- und Verwaltungs-Kommanditgesellschaft
Max-Näder-Strasse 15
37115 Duderstadt / DE
[2000/17]
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
Otto Bock Orthopädische Industrie Besitz- und Verwaltungs-Kommanditgesellschaft
Max-Näder-Strasse 15
D-37115 Duderstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zepf, Armin
Uhlandstrasse 14
37115 Duderstadt / DE
[1996/39]
Representative(s)Gramm, Werner , et al
GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/39]Gramm, Werner, Prof., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Gramm + Lins Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date96102498.120.02.1996
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateDE1995204983U24.03.1995         Original published format: DE 29504983 U
[1996/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0733349
Date:25.09.1996
Language:DE
[1996/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733349
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/02, A44B11/20
[1996/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Hyperextensionsorthese[1996/39]
English:Hyperextension orthesis[1996/39]
French:Orthèse de hyperextension[1996/39]
Examination procedure10.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/41]
05.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.1999Fee for grant paid
28.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DY]DE3928628  (MUNNY) [DY] 1 * column 2, line 53 - line 56; figure 1 *;
 [YA]WO9206606  (PINSO PROD [CA]) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 3,4;
 [A]DE8903944U  (W. PABISCH S.P.A.) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [PX]DE29504983U  (BOCK ORTHOPAED IND [DE]) [PX] 1-4 * the whole document *