Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733835

EP0733835 - Shut-off device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/39]Sealing system for a gate valve
[1999/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erhard GmbH & Co
Meeboldstrasse 22
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[1996/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Bosch, Eduard
Hauptstrasse 5
86747 Maihingen / DE
02 / Funcke, Erhard, Ing.
Uhlandstrasse 14
86720 Nördlingen / DE
03 / Heyl, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Salurnerstr. 11
86720 Nördlingen / DE
04 / Schumann, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Angerweg 2
86720 Nördlingen / DE
[1996/39]
Application number, filing date96102521.020.02.1996
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateDE199510675327.02.1995         Original published format: DE 19506753
[1996/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0733835
Date:25.09.1996
Language:DE
[1996/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0733835
Date:25.06.1997
[1997/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733835
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16K3/02, F16J15/56
[1997/25]
Former International [1996/39]F16K3/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Absperrarmatur[1999/32]
English:Shut-off device[1999/32]
French:Soupape d'arrêt[1999/32]
Former [1996/39]Abdichtsystem für Plattenschieber
Former [1996/39]Sealing system for a gate valve
Former [1996/39]Système d'étanchéité pour un robinet-vanne
Examination procedure26.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
08.10.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
28.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.1999Fee for grant paid
02.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0487905  (WALDENMAIER J E H [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 10, line 4 - line 15; figures 1,5,7 *;
 [Y]US3765647  (GROVE M, et al) [Y] 1 * column 7, line 55 - line 60; figure 13 *;
 [A]WO9300536  (CLIFFORD WALTER ALLEN [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 35, line 8 - line 10 * * page 37, line 1 - line 6; figures 12,19-21 *;
 [DA]DE3009896  (WALDENMAIER J E H [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE1214495  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 2,4,5 * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB1103272  (WILLIAM JOHN COURTNEY TRYTHALL) [A] 1,2,6 * page 2, line 67 - line 81; figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE8800803U  (WECO-ARMATUREN)