Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0729835

EP0729835 - Member and method for protecting ink tank [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/36]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hinami, Jun
c/o Canon KK, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146 / JP
02 / Sugama, Sadayuki
c/o Canon KK, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146 / JP
03 / Okuhara, Hirofumi
c/o Canon KK, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146 / JP
[1996/36]
Representative(s)Grams, Klaus Dieter
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/36]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date96102917.027.02.1996
[1996/36]
Priority number, dateJP1995004037928.02.1995         Original published format: JP 4037995
[1996/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0729835
Date:04.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0729835
Date:21.01.1998
[1998/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0729835
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175, B41J2/165
[1998/02]
Former International [1996/36]B41J2/175
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/36]
TitleGerman:Element und Verfahren zum Schützen eines Tintenbehälters[1996/36]
English:Member and method for protecting ink tank[1996/36]
French:Elément et méthode de protection d'un réservoir d'encre[1996/36]
Examination procedure09.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/33]
06.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2003Fee for grant paid
10.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0418828  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,15 * column 14, line 20 - line 27; figures 13A,13B; claim 2 *;
 [A]EP0576237  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,15 * column 3, line 36 - line 48; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0547874  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,14,15 * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 1 *;
 [A]JPS6219460
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870624), vol. 11, no. 196, Database accession no. (M - 601)<2643> , [A] 1,2,8,15 * abstract *