Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0718952

EP0718952 - Battery power supply system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takehara, Nobuyoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146 / JP
[1996/26]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date96103083.024.06.1993
[1996/26]
Priority number, dateJP1992016968226.06.1992         Original published format: JP 16968292
[1996/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0718952
Date:26.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0718952
Date:31.07.1996
[1996/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0718952
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:H02J9/06, H02J5/00, G05F1/67
[1996/30]
Former International [1996/26]H02J9/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/26]
TitleGerman:Batterie-Energieversorgungsanlage[1996/26]
English:Battery power supply system[1996/26]
French:Système d'alimentation d'énergie à batterie[1996/26]
Examination procedure17.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
31.08.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1999Fee for grant paid
22.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93110143.0  / EP0591620
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DK24.06.2000
GB24.06.2000
LU24.06.2000
IE26.06.2000
MC12.07.2000
[2006/39]
Former [2005/23]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DK24.06.2000
GB24.06.2000
LU24.06.2000
IE26.06.2000
Former [2004/07]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DK24.06.2000
GB24.06.2000
IE26.06.2000
Former [2003/46]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
DK24.06.2000
GB24.06.2000
IE26.06.2000
Former [2003/09]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
GB24.06.2000
IE26.06.2000
Former [2002/23]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
GB24.06.2000
IE26.06.2000
Former [2001/50]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
GB24.06.2000
IE26.06.2000
Former [2001/28]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
GB24.06.2000
Former [2001/09]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4794272  (BAVARO ET AL) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 25 - column 7, line 44; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]US4763014  (MODEL ET AL) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPS59149669  ;
 [A]EP0408059  (MITSUBISHI) [A] 1 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0029744  (EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING) [A] 1 * page 6, line 30 - page 20, line 4; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE3725476  (SIEMENS) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 66; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPS6121516
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840827), vol. 8, no. 285, Database accession no. (E - 287), & JP59149669 A 19840827 (TOSHIBA) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - STEVENS, "utility intertied photovoltaic system islanding experiments", NINTEENTH IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE-1987, LOUISIANA, (19870504), pages 1134 - 1138, XP002004327 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KANDATSU ET AL, "development of a residential use,utility interactive pv inverter", TECHNICAL DIGEST OF THE INTERNATIONAL PVSEC-5,KYOTO,JAPAN, KYOTO, (19901126), pages 905 - 908, XP000215145 [A] 1
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860130), vol. 10, no. 169, Database accession no. (P - 468), & JP61021516 A 19860130 (HITACHI) [A] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationDE4021552
 JP62145314
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol 011, no. 375 (P-644) 8 December 1987 & JP-A-62 145 314 (SANYO) 29 June 1987, & JP62145314 A 19870629