Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0749934

EP0749934 - Method and apparatus for the determination of the dynamic stresses in parts, equipments and machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brandmaier Messen, Steuern, Software
Griesweg 23
72160 Horb / DE
For all designated states
Ingenieursbüro Helmut Sudhop
Elsasser Strasse 4
28211 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/52]For all designated states
Brandmaier Messen, Steuern, Software
Griesweg 23
72160 Horb / DE
For all designated states
Ingenieursbüro Helmut Sudhop
Elsasser Strasse 4
D-28211 Bremen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sudhop, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Curiestr. 22
28357 Bremen / DE
02 / Höhn, Carsten, Dipl.-Ing.
Worpsweder Str. 35a
28832 Achim / DE
[1996/52]
Application number, filing date96103105.101.03.1996
[1996/52]
Priority number, dateDE1995203416U02.03.1995         Original published format: DE 29503416 U
[1996/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0749934
Date:27.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0749934
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B66C13/16, G05B19/4065
[2000/03]
Former International [1996/52]B66C13/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1996/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der dynamischen Beanspruchung an Bauteilen, Anlagen und Maschinen[1996/52]
English:Method and apparatus for the determination of the dynamic stresses in parts, equipments and machines[1996/52]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la détermination des contraintes dynamiques dans les pièces, équipements et machines[1996/52]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/15]
13.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199803   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.1998
31.03.199904   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.1999
31.03.200005   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4628458  (OHTA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9504633  (TANAKA KUNIO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9204665  (FELLOWS CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0052802  (GILDEMEISTER AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0509817  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *