Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0743442

EP0743442 - Cylinder cooling apparatus of multi-cylinder engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kubota Corporation
2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 556-91 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/47]For all designated states
Kubota Corporation
2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome, Naniwa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-91 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yukawa, Masaji, c/o Kubota Corp.
Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Aketa, Masahiro, c/o Kubota Corp.
Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Okamoto, Kazutoshi, c/o Kubota Corp.
Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
04 / Kamada, Yasukazu, c/o Kubota Corp.
Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
05 / Hayatani, Akira, c/o Kubota Corp.
Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
06 / Sugimoto, Masahiko, c/o Kubota Corp.
Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
07 / Yamamoto, Nobuhiro, c/o Kubota Corp.
Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
[1996/47]
Representative(s)Bowles, Sharon Margaret , et al
BOWLES HORTON
Felden House
Dower Mews
High Street
Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/47]Bowles, Sharon Margaret , et al
BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street
Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB
Application number, filing date96103144.001.03.1996
[1996/47]
Priority number, dateJP1995006081820.03.1995         Original published format: JP 6081895
JP1995018121518.07.1995         Original published format: JP 18121595
JP1995021038318.08.1995         Original published format: JP 21038395
[1996/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0743442
Date:20.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0743442
Date:08.01.1997
[1997/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0743442
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:F02F1/10, F02F1/14
[1997/02]
Former International [1996/47]F02F1/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/47]
TitleGerman:Zylinderkühlvorrichtung für eine Mehrzylinder-Brennkraftmaschine[2000/14]
English:Cylinder cooling apparatus of multi-cylinder engine[1996/47]
French:Dispositif de refroidissement des cylindres d'un moteur multicylindre[2000/14]
Former [1996/47]Kühlkreislauf für Brennkraftmaschine
Former [1996/47]Circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur multicylindre
Examination procedure01.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
23.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2000Fee for grant paid
15.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.05.1996DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.05.1996
03.05.1996FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.05.1996
03.05.1996GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.05.1996
03.05.1996IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.05.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]US5188071  (HAN KI B [KR]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 68; figure - *;
 [AD]JP59068155U  ;
 [AD]JP59107946U  ;
 [A]JPS63253156  ;
 [A]EP0068179  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 10 * abstract *
 [AD]  - JP-U-59068155 (MAZDA), XP002018349 [AD] 1 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - JP-U-59107946 (MAZDA), XP002018350 [AD] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890202), vol. 013, no. 045, Database accession no. (M - 792), [A] 1 * abstract *