Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733474

EP0733474 - Sealable polyolefin laminated film with hollow particles, method of making it and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-Strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Former [1998/44]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
An der B 43
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schreck, Michael Dr.
Rauenthaler Weg 32
D-60529 Frankfurt / DE
[1996/39]
Application number, filing date96103281.004.03.1996
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateDE199511008620.03.1995         Original published format: DE 19510086
[1996/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0733474
Date:25.09.1996
Language:DE
[1996/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0733474
Date:11.12.1996
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733474
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/20, B32B27/32
[1996/39]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Siegelfähige Polyolefin-Mehrschichtfolie mit partikelförmigen Hohlkörpern, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Ihre Verwendung[1996/39]
English:Sealable polyolefin laminated film with hollow particles, method of making it and its use[1996/39]
French:Feuille multicouche scellable en polyoléfine avec des particles creuses, procédé pour sa fabrication, et utilisation[1996/39]
Examination procedure11.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/33]
31.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2002Fee for grant paid
30.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PXY]EP0695778  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [PX] 1-19 * claims 1-18,21-25 * * page 2, line 53 - line 57 * * page 3, line 15 - line 23; examples 1-3 * [Y] 1-19;
 [Y]EP0610816  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * page 6, line 18 - line 48; claims 1,4-9,15 *;
 [X]EP0435626  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-16,19 * claims 1,4-10 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 8 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 22 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 36 *;
 [X]US4701369  (DUNCAN GARY L [US]) [X] 1-3,8-11,15-19 * claim - * * column 2, line 47 - line 59 * * column 5, line 13 - line 17 * * column 5, line 36 - line 66 *;
 [A]EP0367613  (COURTAULDS FILMS & PACKAGING [GB]) [A] 1-4,10-12,15,17-19 * column 2, line 1 - line 11; claims 1-3,6,7,9-12 * * column 2, line 35 - line 49 * * column 3, line 1 - line 31 *;
 [A]EP0027586  (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,8,11,14,15,17 * page 7, line 9 - line 16; claims 1,2,8-10 *