Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0731005

EP0731005 - Vehicle steering lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2016Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 08.06.2016  [2016/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE
42, rue Le Corbusier
94000 Créteil / FR
[1999/46]
Former [1996/37]For all designated states
VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE
25 rue Auguste Perret
94000 Creteil / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Canard, Louis
9 rue J. Bernot
58000 Nevers / FR
02 / Brunet, Philippe
5 route des Saulaies
58000 Nevers / FR
03 / Olive, Pascal
11 Place Guy Coquille
58000 Nevers / FR
[1996/37]
Representative(s)Kohn, Philippe
Cabinet Philippe Kohn
30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Kohn, Philippe
Cabinet Philipp Kohn, 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [1996/37]Gamonal, Didier
Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150
94004 Créteil / FR
Application number, filing date96103460.005.03.1996
[1996/37]
Priority number, dateFR1995000289410.03.1995         Original published format: FR 9502894
[1996/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0731005
Date:11.09.1996
Language:FR
[1996/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0731005
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/02
[1996/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1996/37]
TitleGerman:Lenkradschloss für ein Kraftfahrzeug[1996/37]
English:Vehicle steering lock[1996/37]
French:Antivol de direction de véhicule automobile[1996/37]
Examination procedure20.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/16]
23.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Former [2015/21]deleted
Former [2001/17]GB19.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2087435  (NEIMAN) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0195209  (NEIMAN SA) [A] 1 * page 4, line 21 - line 35 *;
 [A]US3313132  (WOLTER)
ExaminationFR2518943