Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0731430

EP0731430 - Sales-registration-data processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
Former [1996/37]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TEC
570 Ohito, Ohito-cho
Tagata-gun, Shizuoka 410-23 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kono, Mitsunori
627-6, Shuzenji, Shuzenjicho
Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Tsuchiya, Yukio
65-2, Suyama
Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
03 / Matsushita, Kunio
40-16, Obaradai
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1996/37]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1996/37]Fuchs, Luderschmidt & Partner
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date96103617.508.03.1996
[1996/37]
Priority number, dateJP1995005161410.03.1995         Original published format: JP 5161495
JP1995005161510.03.1995         Original published format: JP 5161595
[1996/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0731430
Date:11.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0731430
Date:28.05.1997
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0731430
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:G07G1/12, G07G1/00, G07G1/01
[1997/21]
Former International [1996/37]G07G1/12, G07G1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/37]
TitleGerman:Verkaufsdatenregistriervorrichtung[1996/37]
English:Sales-registration-data processing apparatus[1996/37]
French:Appareil de traitement de données de vente[1996/37]
Examination procedure23.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/37]
17.10.1997Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2000Fee for grant paid
01.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4790504  (WILLS DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column W *;
 [A]US5109573  (SHERMAN HOWARD F [US]) [A] 1-3 * column A; figures 1-5; claims 1,2,4-8 *;
 [A]US5187743  (GUMB BEVERLEY W [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4645153  (GRANZOW ROBERT H [US], et al);
 [A]US5005669  (UMEBARA TAKAO [JP], et al)
 [A]  ANONYMOUS, "Display Assembly For Point-Of-Sale Terminal. December 1979.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (197912), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 2846 - 2848, XP002028374 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]  ANONYMOUS, "Adjustable Tilt Mechanism for Data Entry Terminal. June 1981.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (198106), vol. 24, no. 1A, pages 186 - 187, XP002028376 [A] 1 * the whole document *