Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0738819

EP0738819 - Method and punching tool for the fabrication of a joining of profiled work pieces and joining piece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAPID MASCHINENBAU GmbH
Tübinger Strasse 2
72131 Ofterdingen / DE
[1996/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Wydra, Wilhelm
Moselallee 2
56253 Treis-Karden / DE
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Wunderlich, Rainer , et al
Weber & Heim
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/29]Wunderlich, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Former [1996/43]Weber, Otto-Ernst, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date96103891.612.03.1996
[1996/43]
Priority number, dateDE199511440219.04.1995         Original published format: DE 19514402
[1996/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0738819
Date:23.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0738819
Date:23.04.1997
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738819
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:B21D53/74, E06B3/96
[1997/16]
Former International [1996/43]E06B3/96
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1996/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Stanzmesser zur Herstellung einer Verbindung von Profilwerkstücken und Verbindungsstück[1996/43]
English:Method and punching tool for the fabrication of a joining of profiled work pieces and joining piece[1996/43]
French:Procédé et poinçon de perforation pour la fabrication d'une jonction de pièces d'oeuvre en profilés et pièce de jonction[1996/43]
Examination procedure11.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/42]
08.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
26.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1999Fee for grant paid
11.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE2243558  (GOETZ METALLBAU GMBH) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE2522523  (HANS ROTTNER KG HARO MASCHINEN) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE2001608  (DIETZLER WERNER) [DA] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE8621143U  (HIB PROMOTION) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4100946  (HERMANN LOTH) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *