EP0732771 - Connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junji, Muta, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1996/38] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103897.3 | 12.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | JP19950081878 | 13.03.1995 Original published format: JP 8187895 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732771 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732771 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732771 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/422 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
H01R13/4223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/38] | Title | German: | Steckverbinder | [1996/38] | English: | Connector | [1996/38] | French: | Connecteur | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3813948 (SIMON HANS [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [XA]DE4234976 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 10-13 * [A] 5; | [A]US5240434 (YAGI SAKAI [JP], et al) |