Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0738962

EP0738962 - Computer processing unit employing aggressive speculative prefetching of instruction and data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Former [1996/43]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dubey, Pradeep Kumar
25 Martine Avenue No.1015
White Plains, New York 10606 / US
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Teufel, Fritz , et al
IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH
Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht
71137 Ehningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1996/43]Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96104125.815.03.1996
[1996/43]
Priority number, dateUS1995042650221.04.1995         Original published format: US 426502
[1996/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0738962
Date:23.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0738962
Date:07.06.2000
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738962
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/38
[1996/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/43]
TitleGerman:Verarbeitungseinheit mit aggressiver spekulativer Vorausladung von Befehlen und Daten[1996/43]
English:Computer processing unit employing aggressive speculative prefetching of instruction and data[1996/43]
French:Unité de traitement avec pré-extraction spéculative aggressive d'instructions et de données[1996/43]
Examination procedure13.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/15]
23.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2005Fee for grant paid
26.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
06.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR10.08.2005
DE11.11.2005
[2009/01]
Former [2006/36]DE11.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0557884  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-40 * abstract * * page 4, line 4 - line 11 *;
 [PA]  BERNSTEIN DAVID ET AL, "Compiler techniques for data prefetching on the powerPC", PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON PARALLEL ARCHITECTURES AND COMPILATION TECHNIQUES;LIMASSOL, CYPRUS, Parallel Archit Compil Tech Conf Proc;Parallel Architectures and Compilation Techniques - Conference Proceedings 1995 ACM, New York, NY, USA, (1995), pages 19 - 26, XP000901700 [PA] 1-40 * the whole document *
 [A]  KLAIBER A C ET AL, "AN ARCHITECTURE FOR SOFTWARE-CONTROLLED DATA PREFETCHING", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE NEWS,US,ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, (19910501), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0163-5964, pages 43 - 53, XP000229174 [A] 1-40 * abstract * * page 47, column 2, line 46 - page 48, column 2, line 22 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/115953.115958
 [A]  CHEN T -F ET AL, "A PERFORMANCE STUDY OF SOFTWARE AND HARDWARE DATA PREFETCHING SCHEMES", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE NEWS,US,ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, (19940401), vol. 22, no. 2, ISSN 0163-5964, pages 223 - 232, XP000450353 [A] 1-40 * page 224, column 2, line 25 - page 226, column 1, line 48 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/192007.192030