Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733411

EP0733411 - Mobile multifunctional device for the simulation of disposal processes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hund, Kerstin, Dr.
Am Sonnenhang 17
57392 Schmallenberg, Gleidorf / DE
02 / Klein, Werner, Prof.
Birkenweg 21
57392 Schmallenberg / DE
03 / Kördel, Werner, Dr.
Über dem Hagen 14
57392 Schmallenberg, Fleckenberg / DE
04 / Görtz, Theo
Valentinstr. 13
57392 Schmallenberg / DE
05 / Schwarzer, Norbert
Agathastr. 26
57368 Lennestadt / DE
[1996/39]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1999/38]
Former [1996/39]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date96104415.320.03.1996
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateDE199511091724.03.1995         Original published format: DE 19510917
[1996/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0733411
Date:25.09.1996
Language:DE
[1996/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0733411
Date:09.07.1997
[1997/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733411
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B09B1/00, B09C1/00, C05F17/02, G01N33/00
[1996/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahrbare Multifunktions-Entsorgungssimulations-Anlage[1996/39]
English:Mobile multifunctional device for the simulation of disposal processes[1996/39]
French:Dispositif mobile multifonctionnel pour la simulation de procédés d'élimination[1996/39]
Examination procedure25.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
03.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1999Fee for grant paid
23.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]FR785575  (SALUBRA ETS) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 26 - line 101; figure - *
 [A]  - T. POLLER, "Untersuchungen zur Gasbildung aus Hausmüll unter Berücksichtigung des Gehalts von abfallbürtigen LCKW/FCKW", MUELL UND ABFALL, BERLIN DE, (199101), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 20 - 25, XP000176962 [A] 1,2,8,11,12 * paragraph [0003] *
 [A]  - A. MENNERICH, "Gemeinsame Ablagerung von Hausmüll und Gewerbeabfällen", MUELL UND ABFALL, BERLIN DE, (1984), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 225 - 231, XP000602526 [A] 1,8,11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] *