Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733725

EP0733725 - Growth of silicon single crystal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research Development Corporation of Japan
4-1-8, Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama-ken 332 / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO., LTD.
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
For all designated states
KOMATSU ELECTRONIC METALS CO., LTD
2612, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi
Kangawa 254-0014 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Steel Corporation
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN
4-1-8, Hon-cho
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332 / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO., LTD.
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
For all designated states
KOMATSU ELECTRONIC METALS CO., LTD
2612, Shinomiya
Hiratsuka-shi Kangawa 254 / JP
For all designated states
NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN
4-1-8, Hon-cho
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332 / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO., LTD.
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
For all designated states
KOMATSU ELECTRONIC METALS CO., LTD
2612, Shinomiya
Hiratsuka-shi Kangawa 254 / JP
For all designated states
NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
For all designated states
MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION
5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Former [1997/02]For all designated states
RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN
4-1-8, Hon-cho
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332 / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO., LTD.
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO SITIX CORPORATION
1, Higashihama-cho Amagasaki-SHI
Hyogo 660 / JP
For all designated states
KOMATSU ELECTRONIC METALS CO., LTD
2612, Shinomiya
Hiratsuka-shi Kangawa 254 / JP
For all designated states
NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
For all designated states
MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION
5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN
4-1-8, Hon-cho
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332 / JP
For all designated states
Izunome, Koji
1770-1-502, Arakawaoki, Ami-machi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaragi-ken 300-11 / JP
For all designated states
Kawanishi, Souroku
16-2, Tokadai 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-26 / JP
For all designated states
Togawa, Shinji
4182-3, Imakashima
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-26 / JP
For all designated states
Ikari, Atsushi
12-15, Tokodai 2-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-26 / JP
For all designated states
Sasaki, Hitoshi
545, Oonari 1-chome
Omiya-shi, Saitama-ken, 331 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Izunome, Koji
1-502, Arakawaoki 1770, Ami-machi
Inashikigun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-11 / JP
02 / Kawanishi, Souroku
16-2, Tokodai 1-xhome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-26 / JP
03 / Togawa, Shinji
4182-3, Imakashima
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-26 / JP
04 / Ikari, Atsushi
12-15, Tokodai 2-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-26 / JP
05 / Sasaki, Hitoshi
545, Oonari 1-chome
Omiya-shi, Saitama-ken, 331 / JP
06 / Kimura, Shigeyuki
712, Takezono 3-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 305 / JP
[1996/39]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/39]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date96104453.420.03.1996
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateJP1995009143224.03.1995         Original published format: JP 9143295
[1996/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0733725
Date:25.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0733725
Date:07.05.1997
[1997/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733725
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:C30B15/14, C30B29/06
[1997/16]
Former International [1996/39]C30B15/00, C30B15/20, C30B15/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Züchtung von Silizium-Einkristall[1996/39]
English:Growth of silicon single crystal[1996/39]
French:Croissance d'un monocristal de silicium[1996/39]
Examination procedure09.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/50]
12.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US4565671  (MATSUTANI KINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1;
 [A]US4830703  (MATSUTANI KINYA [JP]) [A] 1;
 [A]US4619730  (SUZUKI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1;
 [A]  KOLKER H, "The behaviour of nonrotational striations in silicon", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, DEC. 1980, NETHERLANDS, ISSN 0022-0248, vol. 50, no. 4, pages 852 - 858, XP000650895 [A] 1

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(80)90147-5